SOUTH ATLANTIC MEDAL ASSOCIATION 82 WALES BRANCH
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The primary purpose of SAMAWALES is to maintain and promote a sense of pride and comradeship amongst all veterans of the 1982 Falklands Conflict. We assist and support veterans and families with PTSD and other mental and physical illnesses. We reunite comrades and friends through private and social reunions/meetings.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2018
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Cymru
Llywodraethu
- 27 Mai 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 13 Tachwedd 2018: Tynnwyd (DILEU AR GAIS)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £7.99k | £2.35k | £4.84k | £5.24k | £5.26k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £4.32k | £5.64k | £520 | £5.37k | £4.18k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2018 | 30 Hydref 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2018 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2017 | 07 Rhagfyr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 25 Ionawr 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 12 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(1) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES BY MAINTAINING CONTACT BETWEEN SERVING MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND MEMBERS AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES WHO SERVED IN THE 1982 FALKLAND CONFLICT. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES IN MATTERS RELATING TO THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT AND IN PARTICULAR THE CONTRIBUTION OF SERVICE PERSONNEL FROM WALES. (3) TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AT LARGE BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING A MEMORIAL TO THOSE SERVICE PERSONNEL AND CIVILIANS FROM WALES WHO DIED DURING THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT. (4) TO RELIEVE SERVING AND FORMER MEMBERS OF THE ARMED FORCES AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO SERVED IN THE 1982 FALKLANDS CONFLICT WHO ARE IN NEED BY VIRTUE OF HARDSHIP, SICKNESS OR OLD AGE: A)MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM OR B)PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM OR C) MARKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE "IN NEED".
Maes buddion
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window