Dogfen lywodraethu TAI PAWB

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 NOVEMBER 2004, AS AMENDED ON 2 JUNE 2005, AS AMENDED 13 JULY 2009. as amended on 14 Nov 2019 as amended on 17 Feb 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Objects of the Charity are to promote equality, diversity and social inclusion in the provision of housing in Wales, in particular social housing, for the benefit of the public in Wales by the elimination of discrimination on the grounds of race, age, disability, gender, gender identity, sexual orientation, religion or belief or any other basis of possible discrimination.
Maes buddion
WALES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.