THE PROJECT AFRICAN WILDERNESS TRUST
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
PAW Trust supports and promotes environmental conservation in wilderness areas, particularily Mwabvi Wildlife Reserve in Malawi. It provides employment, ecotourist facilities, training and education opportunities for local people and international visitors. The UK Trust oversees the formal agreement with the Government of Malawi, fund-raising, practical support and promotional activity.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 April 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Anifeiliaid
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Malawi
Llywodraethu
- 21 Mawrth 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 05 Gorffennaf 2018: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- PAW (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/04/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £96.16k | £31.04k | £1.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £96.52k | £35.23k | £3.23k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Ebrill 2015 | 20 Gorffennaf 2017 | 507 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Ebrill 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2004
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE TO: (A) ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RESEARCH IN HOLISTIC RESOURCES MANAGEMENT WITH REGARD TO THE MWABVI GAME RESERVE AND ASSOCIATED WILDLIFE MANAGEMENT AND RURAL DEVELOPMENT AREAS IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA (B) SECURE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND IMPROVEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE WORLD'S ANIMAL, BIRD, FISH AND PLANT LIFE, ITS INDUSTRIAL, URBAN, RURAL NATURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS OF ECOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE, AND ITS NATURAL RESOURCES BUT WITH PARTICULAR EMPHASIS ON THE MWABVI GAME RESERVE IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA AND ITS ENVIRONS, AND ON OTHER ENVIRONMENTS IN MWABVI GAME RESERVE; (C) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF NATURAL HISTORY ENVIRONMENT STUDIES, ECOLOGY AND RESOURCE CONSERVATION IN INDUSTRIAL URBAN, RURAL AND MARINE ENVIRONMENTS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; (D) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION AND DEVELOPMENT OF OPPORTUNITIES AND RESOURCES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA IN CONNECTION WITH THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS OR UNEMPLOYMENT.
Maes buddion
EAST AND CENTRAL AFRICA AND ANYWHERE ELSE IN THE WORLD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window