Dogfen lywodraethu Lotus Families
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 14/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2014 as amended on 01 Apr 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A)TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (B) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; (D) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF EASTBOURNE AND THE AREAS OF LEWES AND WEALDEN DISTRICT AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Maes buddion
THE BOROUGH OF EASTBOURNE; LEWES AND WEALDEN DISTRICT AND THEIR ENVIRONS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.