Dogfen lywodraethu SHAKIRY CHARITY FOR SOCIAL SOLIDARITY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/07/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 08/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 26/06/2015 as amended on 22 Jan 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFICIENT USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES IN IRAQ AND THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, TRAINING AND TECHNICAL AND PROFESSIONAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE. RELIEF OF POVERTY: THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN IRAQ AND AMONG IRAQI COMMUNITIES (IN PARTICULAR WIDOWS AND ORPHANS, THE SICK, DISABLED, ELDERLY AND INTERNALLY FORCED DISPLACED PEOPLE) BY PROVIDING: SPONSORSHIP, FINANCIAL SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANIZATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. · COMMUNITY CAPACITY BUILDING: TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IRAQI COMMUNITIES IN IRAQ AND LONDON IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY · SOCIAL INCLUSION: TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES IN IRAQ BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.”
Maes buddion
IRAQ AND THE UNITED KINGDOM
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.