Dogfen lywodraethu MARINELIFE

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 FEB 2004, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 28 JUL 2005, 15 DEC 2007, 6 MAR 2010, 14 OCT 2010 AND 2 DEC 2010.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF MARINE ANIMALS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DOLPHINS, WHALES, PORPOISES, AND CETACEANS IN ALL THEIR FORMS AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SAME BY: (I) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC TOWARDS THE NEED FOR THEIR PRESERVATION; (II) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH ON THE PRESERVATION OF ALL SPECIES OF MARINE ANIMALS AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH; AND (III) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN THEIR POPULATIONS, HABITATS AND BEHAVIOUR.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.