Dogfen lywodraethu CHRIST FOUNDATION MINISTRIES NOTTINGHAM

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED EXECUTED ON 7TH DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 8TH JUNE 2005 AND NAME CHANGED BY RESOLUTION 09/06/06, 15 FEBRUARY 2009 AND 16 DECEMBER 2010. as amended on 07 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF NOTTINGHAM BY THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, MEDIATION, SUPPORT AND ADVISORY SERVICES AND AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH LIMITED FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AS THEY SHALL DEEM APPROPRIATE.
Maes buddion
NOTTINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.