Dogfen lywodraethu NOTTINGHAM PLAYHOUSE TRUST LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 07 MARCH 2005 as amended on 28 Jun 2018 as amended on 24 Jan 2019 as amended on 18 Feb 2019 as amended on 28 Sep 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
5 The Charity’s objects are specifically restricted to the advancement of education by: 5.1 The production of plays, ballets, operas, musicals, shows, digital content and other productions of artistic or educational value; 5.2 The encouragement of artistic understanding and appreciation; 5.3 The promotion of education and training in and about the arts; and 5.4 The advancement of public knowledge and understanding of the arts Particularly (but not exclusively) in relation to drama, literature, music, singing and dancing.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BUT MAY EXTEND NATIONALLY.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.