Dogfen lywodraethu Safer Communities Limited

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 APRIL 1996 AS AMENDED 27 OCTOBER 2000, 19 APRIL 2002, 15 APRIL 2004 AND 8 DECEMBER 2005 as amended on 14 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY BY THE PROMOTION OF CRIME PREVENTION AND COMMUNITY SAFETY AND BY THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC, PRIVATE AND VOLUNTARY SECTOR PARTICIPATION IN PLANNED AND CO-ORDINATED APPROACHES TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF CRIME PREVENTION AND COMMUNITY SAFETY IN THE AREA COMPRISED OF THE FIVE BOROUGH COUNCILS OF DARLINGTON, HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR & CLEVELAND AND STOCKTON ON TEES (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "TEES VALLEY")
Maes buddion
DARLINGTON, HARTLEPOOL, MIDDLESBROUGH, REDCAR & CLEVELAND AND STOCKTON ON TEES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.