CHAIRS AND SPARES
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Chairs and Spares is a social business bringing together representatives of a number of organisations to make available through reuse/recycling items that will be of benefit to those on low income, create opportunities for training and enterprise and enhance peoples quality of life, self worth and employability.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2016
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Swydd Amwythig
- Telford & Wrekin
Llywodraethu
- 12 Awst 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 26 Awst 2016: Tynnwyd (DILEU GWIRFODDOL)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £96.35k | £152.51k | £116.56k | £87.79k | £89.32k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £93.39k | £142.35k | £112.81k | £114.09k | £111.32k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Gorffennaf 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2016 | 26 Gorffennaf 2016 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 05 Awst 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2015 | 05 Awst 2015 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 29 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2014 | 15 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 17 Rhagfyr 2013 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2013 | 17 Rhagfyr 2013 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 JULY 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND PROTECT OR PRESERVE THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS:- (A) BY HELPING TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE OF BOTH INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED OF ESSENTIAL HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT AS IDENTIFIED TO THE CHARITY BY STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY AGENCIES THROUGH COLLECTING DONATED FURNITURE AND HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT AND STORING AND CHECKING ELECTRICAL APPLIANCES FOR SAFETY BEFORE DELIVERING TO THOSE IN NEED. (B) BY RECYCLING, RE-USING RENOVATING AND REPAIRING HOUSEHOLD ITEMS THAT WOULD OTHERWISE HAVE TO BE DISPOSED OF AS LANDFILL. (C) BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE UNEMPLOYED, THOSE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND THOSE ON COMMUNITY SERVICE OR SIMILAR ORDERS, TO PRACTISE AND ACQUIRE SKILLS AND GAIN CONFIDENCE WHILST CONTRIBUTING TO THE WELFARE OF THEIR OWN COMMUNITIES. (D) THROUGH ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC ABOUT THE BENEFITS TO THE ENVIRONMENT OF RECYCLING, RE-USE OF WASTE MANAGEMENT AND TO PROMULGATE THE VALUE OF SUSTAINABLE LIFESTYLES. (E) THROUGH THE ESTABLISHMENT OF VOLUNTEER TRAINING SCHEMES TO UNDERTAKE THE REPAIR AND/OR RESTORATION OF DONATED ITEMS OR ANY OTHER ASPECTS OF THE CHARITY'S WORK AS APPROPRIATE. SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IS DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS. IT IS A DYNAMIC PROCESS WHICH ENABLES ALL PEOPLE TO REALISE THEIR POTENTIAL, AND TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE, IN WAYS WHICH SIMULTANEOUSLY PROTECT AND ENHANCE THE EARTH'S LIFE SUPPORT SYSTEMS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, TELFORD AND WREKIN AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window