Hanes ariannol REVIVAL OUTREACH CHURCH UK
Rhif yr elusen: 1110431
Up to date (138 days late)
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £16.71k | £24.82k | £16.61k | £22.54k | £24.31k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £16.03k | £21.76k | £3.89k | £20.77k | £22.51k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.