YALA HEALTH AND EDUCATION FUND
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Yala Health and Education Fund was created to adminster a --ú70,000 bequest from De Beers towards helping tsunami-affected communities in Sri Lanka. The programme includes sponsoring 50 tsunami children over three years as well as supporting schools, orphanages and a maternity clinic in Hambantota. YHEF is closed to new donations. It is a sister charity to Yala Fund reg. charity no. 1111692.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2007
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Sri Lanka
Llywodraethu
- 29 Mehefin 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Hydref 2008: Tynnwyd (DILEU GWIRFODDOL)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £69.68k | £890 | £1.53k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £33.36k | £16.32k | £9.93k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | 01 Ionawr 2008 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2007 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 28 Awst 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2006 | 31 Awst 2007 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 26 Mai 2006 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2005 | 26 Mai 2006 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24 JUNE 2005
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES IN SRI LANKA (IN PARTICULAR THE COASTAL COMMUNITIES NEAR YALA NATIONAL PARK) WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF THE EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI DISASTER THAT OCCURRED ON 26TH DECEMBER 2004 MAINLY BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOLLOWING BY: (A) RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR MAINTAINING SCHOOLS; AND (C) PROTECTING AND PRESERVING HEALTH AND RELIEVING THE SICK IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY ESTABLISHING AND/OR MAINTAINING MEDICAL CLINICS AND/OR PROVIDING MEDICAL SUPPLIES AND EQUIPMENT.
Maes buddion
SRI LANKA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window