CLIFTON-UPON-TEME CHILDREN'S CENTRE LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Support families with young children by co-ordinating services and facilities in the Teme Valley. Provide outreach services which aim to address the issue of rural isolation and help families come together. Signpost families to other child related services and childcare support in the Teme Valley. Bring services closer to the families via weekly coffee shops provided by our volunteer teams
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2009
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hybu Iechyd Neu’r Achub O Fywydau
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Swydd Gaerwrangon
Llywodraethu
- 17 Hydref 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 06 Hydref 2010: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- TEME VALLEY CHILDREN'S CENTRE (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £102.96k | £110.89k | £144.85k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £107.41k | £111.46k | £135.26k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 19 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 20 Ionawr 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 02 Rhagfyr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 19 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2008 | 14 Ionawr 2009 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 25 Hydref 2007 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2007 | 19 Hydref 2007 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF CLIFTON-UPON-TEME AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (THE AREA OF BENEFIT) BY ASSOCIATING THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO: ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR BOTH ADULTS AND CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN; RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH AND RELIEVE POVERTY.
Maes buddion
CLIFTON-UPON-TEME AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window