DOROTHY MILES CULTURAL CENTRE LIMITED
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
WORKING WITH PEOPLE OF ALL AGES TO ENHANCE COMMUNICATION AND UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE THROUGH SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES. THE CHARITY PROVIDES BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE COURSES UP TO LEVEL 3 TOGETHER AND AD HOC SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE YEAR.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 July 2008
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Surrey
Llywodraethu
- 12 Awst 2005: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Chwefror 2014: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/07/2006 | 31/07/2007 | 31/07/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £92.38k | £104.66k | £62.32k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £90.57k | £98.45k | £72.91k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2011 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2010 | Heb ei gyflwyno |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 DECEMBER 2004.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE RELIEF OF DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PERSONS IN PARTICULAR BY:- 3.I THE EDUCATION AND RAISING OF AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE PUBLIC WITH REGARD TO THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3.II. THE PROVISION TO BOTH DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PERSONS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF TRAINING IN BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE; 3.III. THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME FACILITIES TO SUCH PERSONS IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE; 3.IV. THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNICATION , CREATIVITY, CONFIDENCE, TRAINING , A SENSE OF COMMUNITY AND A MUTUAL AWARENESS BETWEEN DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SURREY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window