Dogfen lywodraethu CENTRAL AND WEST LANCASHIRE CARERS LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/11/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/04/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/04/2014
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF PERSONS WHO ARE ILL, DISABLED OR WHO ARE ELDERLY AND HAVE A CHARITABLE NEED, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY RESIDENT OR WORKING IN LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS, BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO THOSE PERSONS, THEIR RELATIVES OR CARERS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES.
Maes buddion
LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.