Dogfen lywodraethu VICTORY HOUSING TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/11/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13/02/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016 as amended on 26 Nov 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE TRUST'S OBJECTS SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: 1) PROVIDING HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS: (A) IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (B) WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY), OR CHRONICALLY SICK, AND ARE IN NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER BENEFITS PROVIDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CONDITION; (C) WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NEED OF HOUSING IN ORDER THAT THEY MAY CARRY OUT CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF OTHERS; (D) FOR ANY OTHER PERSON FOR WHOM IT WOULD BE CHARITABLE TO PROVIDE HOUSES, HOSTELS OR OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION. 2) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOMES OCCUPIED BY THEM AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; 3) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 4) PROMOTING OR CARRYING OUT ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE THAT CAN BE CARRIED OUT BY A TRUST REGISTERED AS A SOCIAL LANDLORD WITH THE HOUSING CORPORATION.
Maes buddion
NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.