Dogfen lywodraethu Citizens Advice Braintree & South Essex Limited
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/06/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 31/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 MAR 2018 as amended on 24 Mar 2018 as amended on 22 Mar 2019 as amended on 24 Apr 2019 as amended on 03 Oct 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity's objects are to promote any charitable purpose for the public benefit by the advancement of education, the protection and preservation of health and the relief of poverty, sickness and distress in particular, but without limitation, for the benefit of the community in the local authority areas of Basildon, Brentwood, Castle Point, Rochford, Thurrock and surrounding areas.
Maes buddion
BASILDON, BRENTWOOD, CASTLE POINT, ROCHFORD, THURROCK AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.