Dogfen lywodraethu OM International
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/12/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 05/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01/06/2012 as amended on 27 Feb 2020
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO SUPPORT CHARITIES AND NGO'S BOTH IN THE UK AND WORLDWIDE WHOSE PURPOSES INCLUDE: 3.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION (PARTICULARLY FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF LITERACY AND VOCATIONAL SKILLS) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD; 3.2 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND OF POVERTY BY ASSISTING ANY SICK PERSONS OR NECESSITOUS PERSONS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; 3.3 THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING AND DISTRESS IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; 3.4 THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD; 3.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION; OR 3.6 ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE ASSOCIATED WITH THE ABOVE THAT MAY BE OF BENEFIT TO THE COMMUNITY; THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SERVICES INCLUDING ADMINISTRATION AND CO-ORDINATION.
Maes buddion
UK AND WORLDWIDE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.