Dogfen lywodraethu THE NATIONAL GARDEN SCHEME
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 18 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 JUN 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 24 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 MAR 2017 null
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. THE OBJECTS ARE 3.1 ASSISTING SUCH CHARITIES OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT; 3.2 SUPPORTING CHARITIES, IN THEIR WORK IN THE PROVISION OF NURSING AND CARING, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROMOTION OF HEALTH; AND 3.3 SUPPORTING THE QUEEN’S NURSING INSTITUTE IN ITS WORK.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.