THE ALLIANCE FOR BLACK CHILDREN
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Our main activities are: Providing themed holiday activities, fishing club to develop social, cultural and educational skills. Family support via referrals from statutory organisations, self referrals for ages 0 - 19 years. Study support for children aged 8 -13 in schools in Wellingborough. Community events -participation on multi-agency forums including Local Area Agreement locality group.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 07 February 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Swydd Northampton
Llywodraethu
- 12 Medi 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 09 Mai 2013: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- ABC (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 07/02/2008 | 07/02/2009 | 07/02/2010 | 07/02/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £116.94k | £163.82k | £200.78k | £186.25k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £109.22k | £160.40k | £174.55k | £200.38k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Chwefror 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Chwefror 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Chwefror 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Chwefror 2012 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Chwefror 2011 | 29 Tachwedd 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Chwefror 2011 | 09 Tachwedd 2011 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 07 Chwefror 2010 | 29 Tachwedd 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 07 Chwefror 2010 | 08 Tachwedd 2010 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 30 MAY 2006 AND 7 AUGUST 2006.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, OF AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN ORIGIN; AND (II) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS BY ENDEAVOURING TO RAISE LEVELS OF TOLERANCE THROUGH PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND EXPLANATION OF AFRICAN/CARIBBEAN CULTURE.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window