Dogfen lywodraethu Population Matters
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 11 OCT 2014 AS AMENDED ON 04 JUL 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29 JUL 2019 as amended on 28 Nov 2020 as amended on 16 Mar 2023as amended on 24 Oct 2023 as amended on 08 Jun 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
2.1 The Charity’s objects are for the public benefit: 2.1.1 to advance the education of the public in issues relating to human population worldwide and its impact on sustainability; 2.1.2 to advance, promote and encourage research into ecologically sustainable human population levels in all or any part or parts of the world and to publicise the results of such research; and 2.1.3 to advance environmental protection by promoting policies, in all or any part or parts of the world, which will lead or contribute to the achievement of ecologically sustainable human population levels.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.