Dogfen lywodraethu CYMORTH (CYMRU)
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/04/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/03/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/11/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 NOV 2017
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO VOLUNTARY AND OTHER AGENCIES ON THE FINANCE, DEVELOPMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF HOUSING AND RELATED SCHEMES AND SERVICES INTENDED TO SUPPORT SUCH INDIVIDUALS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.