ROTHERHAM FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To provide education and training in family history to members.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Rotherham
Llywodraethu
- 28 Mawrth 2019: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 516226 DONCASTER & DISTRICT FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
- 06 Ebrill 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 28 Mawrth 2019: Tynnwyd (WEDI UNO)
- RFHS (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.11k | £4.52k | £3.07k | £2.23k | £5.43k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £4.99k | £5.35k | £3.99k | £3.50k | £3.81k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | 10 Mai 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | 16 Mai 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2016 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | 26 Ebrill 2016 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2015 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JANUARY 2003
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY WITHIN THE AREA OF INTEREST. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE SOCIETY MAY ARRANGE: I) TO PROVIDE A FORUM FOR MEMBERS TO MEET AND DISCUSS THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY; II) TO PRODUCE A NEWSLETTER/JOURNAL REGULARLY; III) TO ARRANGE A PROGRAMME OF LECTURES, VISITS AND OTHER ACTIVITIES CONNECTED WITH SUBJECTS OF INTEREST TO THE SOCIETY; IV) TO SEEK OUT, TRANSCRIBE, INDEX AND WHENEVER POSSIBLE, PUBLISH OR MAKE AVAILABLE MATERIAL RELEVANT TO THE INTERESTS OF THE SOCIETY; V) TO PROVIDE GUIDANCE IN FAMILY HISTORY RESEARCH AND STUDY, TO THOSE LIVING ELSEWHERE WHOSE FAMILIES COME FROM THE AREA VI) TO HOLD AND MAINTAIN A LIBRARY OF PRINTED AND OTHER WORKS FOR THE USE OF SOCIETY MEMBERS AND, IF PRACTICABLE EXTEND THIS TO INTERESTED MEMBERS OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC.
Maes buddion
ROTHERHAM, SOUTH YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window