Dogfen lywodraethu THE BELTEX SHEEP SOCIETY

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/10/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/02/1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/10/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) (I) TO PROMOTE THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF AGRICULTURE BY ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BREEDING OF BELTEX SHEEP AND THE MAINTENANCE OF THE PURITY OF THE BREED IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. (II) TO ENCOURAGE, PROMOTE AND IMPROVE THE BREEDING OF BELTEX SHEEP TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF THE BREED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. (III) TO UNDERTAKE RESEARCH ON SHEEP BREEDING AND MATTERS RELATING THERETO AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Maes buddion
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.