OASIS GLOBAL TRUST

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THE FOLLOWING CAUSES; EDUCATIONAL HOUSING HEALTH RELIEF OF HARDSHIP DUE TO NATURAL DISASTERS AROUND GLOBE PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING CHRISTIAN ORGANIZATIONS AND CHURCHES
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
2 Gwirfoddolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Nid oes gan unrhyw weithwyr gyfanswm buddion dros £60,000Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Anabledd
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Cymru A Lloegr
- India
- Rwmania
Llywodraethu
- 08 Mehefin 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- OASIS (Enw gwaith)
- OGT (Enw gwaith)
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau cwynion
- Polisi a gweithdrefnau diogelu
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR S GEORGE | Cadeirydd |
|
|
|||||
Dr RIYA ELIZABETH GEORGE | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr JOHN CHARLIE MAVELI | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH GEORGE | Ymddiriedolwr |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £15.00k | £9.80k | £16.96k | £22.74k | £24.96k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £10.41k | £16.17k | £13.78k | £19.40k | £17.24k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 23 Ionawr 2025 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 14 Mai 2024 | 104 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 15 Rhagfyr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 22 Ionawr 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 21 Chwefror 2021 | 21 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
TRUST DEED DATED 8 JANUARY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS IN THIRD WORLD/DEVELOPING COUNTRIES FOR UNDERGRADUATE AND POST GRADUATE EDUCATION INCLUDING MEDICINE, NURSING, ENGINEERING AND COMPUTER STUDIES; (B) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN INDIAN STATES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; (C) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN INDIA AND AFRICA BY PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS/SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; (D) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES, THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN INDIA EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES; (E) TO RELIEVE PEOPLE WHO ARE ELDERLY OR DISABLED RESIDENT IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES BY THE PROVISIONS OF CARERS AND BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT AND TRAINING TO SUCH CARERS; (F) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS AMONG PERSONS WHO ARE CARING FOR OR NURSING A PERSON WITH A PHYSICAL OR MENTAL DISABILITY IN ANY PLACE AND THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE WHO ARE CHRONICALLY SICK OR DISABLED BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND ADVICE FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE; (G) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING PERMANENTLY OR TEMPORARILY IN THE INDIAN SUBCONTINENT AND AFRICAN COUNTRIES INCLUDING FINANCIAL HELP TO CHARITABLE HOSPITALS AND OTHER HEALTH INSTITUTIONS; (H) TO ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL OR PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORK AND RECREATION; (I) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POOR HEALTH AND OLD AGE AMONGST PEOPLE LIVING IN INDIAN STATES BY PROVIDING A LOCAL SERVICE FOR HOSPITALS, RESIDENTIAL HOMES AND SIMILAR INSTITUTIONS; (J) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED (INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID); (K) THE RELIEF AND ASSISTANCE OF PEOPLE IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD WHO ARE THE VICTIMS OF WAR OR NATURAL DISASTER, TROUBLE OR CATASTROPHE IN PARTICULAR BY THE SUPPLY OF MEDICAL AID TO SUCH PERSONS; (L) TO OFFER FINANCIAL AID TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN CHILDREN'S ORPHANAGES AND HOMES FOR THE ELDERLY IN ANY INDIAN STATES
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
CHAIR
ROWAN HOUSE
ROWHILL ROAD
DARTFORD
DA2 7QQ
- Ffôn:
- 01322666511
- E-bost:
- simongeorge45@aol.com
- Gwefan:
-
Dim gwybodaeth ar gael
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window