Dogfen lywodraethu THE ENDOWMENT FUND FOR TACRI
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/04/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2014 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/06/2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(3.1) THE OBJECTS OF THE FUND (THE "OBJECTS") ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE AND CONDUCT RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF COFFEE PRODUCTION IN TANZANIA AND TO DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT; (B) RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF COFFEE PRODUCERS IN TANZANIA BY ENABLING AND ASSISTING THEM TO IMPROVE THE EFFECTIVE MANAGEMENT OF THEIR NATURAL RESOURCES; AND (C) PROVIDE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO TACRI IN RESPECT OF THE OBJECTS REFERRED TO ABOVE (INCLUDING FINANCIAL AND ADMINISTRATIVE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT IN RESPECT OF THE PROMOTION OF THOSE OBJECTS). (3.2) IN THE OBJECTS: (A) "TACRI" MEANS THE NOT-FOR-PROFIT BODY CORPORATE ESTABLISHED UNDER TANZANIAN LAW ON 9 AUGUST 2000 AND KNOWN AS THE "TANZANIAN COFFEE RESEARCH INSTITUTE" AND SUCH OTHER BODY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER TO BE SUCCESSOR TO TACRI. (B) "TANZANIA" MEANS THE UNITED REPUBLIC OF TANZANIA.
Maes buddion
TANZANIA.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.