Dogfen lywodraethu MARESA VON STOCKERT LIMITED
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 25 APRIL 2006 AS AMENDED ON 21 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED ON 02 MAR 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 SEP 2020 as amended on 23 Feb 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. The Company?s objects (the Objects) are to promote, maintain, improve and advance education by the encouragement of the arts including, without limitation the arts of dance, film, installation, dance-theatre, drama, mime, literature, singing and music by:- 3.1 providing opportunities for the general public to experience high quality arts activities, including film, visual arts installations and exhibitions, theatres and festival performances regionally, nationally and internationally 3.2 creating new performances, films, installations and choreography and present this at visual arts and performance venues and sites regionally, nationally and internationally.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.