THE SLEEPING GIANT FOUNDATION
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
1. Events:- Santa Parade; Revival of Mari Lwyd tradition; Community Coach Excursions 2. Media:- Completion of projects involving editing, filming and DVD production. 3. Heritage:-Recording the memories of local residents; Archiving local heritage material; Revival of the traditional art of storytelling; Exhibitions.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 August 2012
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Castell-nedd Port Talbot
- Dinas Abertawe
- Powys
- Sir Gaerfyrddin
Llywodraethu
- 21 Awst 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Awst 2013: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- SGF (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £29.35k | £17.07k | £14.80k | £16.25k | £7.37k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £39.67k | £18.84k | £20.66k | £17.70k | £9.21k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Gorffennaf 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Gorffennaf 2013 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2012 | 13 Hydref 2012 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2012 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2011 | 03 Hydref 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Awst 2010 | 23 Chwefror 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Awst 2010 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 18 JULY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE COMMUNITIES IN THE AREA OF THE HEADWATERS OF THE RIVER TAWE) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING. B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY TO NEW OR EXISTING BUSINESSES, WHETHER IN THE PRIVATE OR VOLUNTARY SECTORS. C) THE ESTABLISHMENT OR PROVISION OF PREMISES TO ASSIST NEW OR EXISTING BUSINESSES, WHETHER IN THE PRIVATE OR VOLUNTARY SECTORS. D) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES. E) THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE. F) THE PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. G) THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OR THE ENVIRONMENT. H) THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE POWYS, DYFED, CARMARTHENSHIRE, NEATH, PORT TALBOT, SWANSEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window