LIVING WATER INTERNATIONAL MINISTRY UK
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
The charity is a Christian church and will hold meetings and services for the worship of God, the teaching of the Bible, the proclamation of the Gospel and the fellowship of Christian believers. It will also, by various legitimate means, present and communicate the Christian faith to the wider public.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 23 April 2015
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Cymorth Dramor/cymorth I’r Newynog
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Cyllid Arall
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Dinas Llundain
- Milton Keynes
- Philipinas
Llywodraethu
- 30 Mehefin 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 04 Mai 2017: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
- JA1 LONDON (Enw gwaith)
- JESUS THE ANOINTED ONE MINISTRY (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2011 | 30/04/2012 | 01/04/2013 | 01/04/2014 | 23/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £4.12k | £3.55k | £1.87k | £918 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £3.37k | £2.58k | £1.50k | £639 | £0 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 23 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 23 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 23 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 23 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 23 Ebrill 2015 | 16 Hydref 2015 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 23 Ebrill 2015 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 01 Ebrill 2014 | 24 Rhagfyr 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 01 Ebrill 2014 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 08/05/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01/03/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE OF THE DECLARATION IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST; AND (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE SAID LOCATION AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE HOUNSLOW
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window