Dogfen lywodraethu PARKWAY GREEN HOUSING TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/10/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 17/05/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 APR 2016 as amended on 26 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF: (3.1) THE BUSINESS OF PROVIDING HOUSING AND/OR HOSTELS AND SOCIAL HOUSING AND/OR (WHERE APPROPRIATE) SPECIALLY DESIGNED OR ADAPTED HOUSING, AND PROVIDING ASSISTANCE TO HELP HOUSE PEOPLE, ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AND AMENITIES AND/OR SERVICES FOR POOR PEOPLE OR FOR THE RELIEF OF AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PEOPLE; (3.2) TO PROVIDE, EITHER BY ITSELF OR WITH OTHERS, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE SERVICES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE WHO NEED SUCH FACILITIES BECAUSE OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABILITY, POVERTY, SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OR ANY OTHER GROUP ORGANISATION OWNS OR MANAGES PROPERTY, (3.3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST THE RESIDENTS OF THE LOCAL AUTHORITY AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OR ANY OTHER GROUP ORGANISATION OWNS OR MANAGES HOUSING STOCK, (3.4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, (PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE) AND PROVIDING PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE, IN EACH CASE FOR RESIDENTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE BENEFICIARIES, (3.5) MAINTAINING, INCLUDING OR PROVIDING PUBLIC AMENITIES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTEREST OF REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN AREAS IN WHICH THE COMPANY OR ANY OTHER GROUP ORGANISATION MAY CHOOSE TO OPERATE, AND (3.6) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT THAT IS NOT PROHIBITED FROM TIME TO TIME FOR A COMPANY REGISTERED AS A PROVIDER OF SOCIAL HOUSING WITH THE REGULATOR UNDER THE 2008 ACT.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.