Dogfen lywodraethu NATIONAL MIGRAINE CENTRE
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/05/2011 as amended on 28 Oct 2022 as amended on 06 Mar 2023 as amended on 24 Feb 2023
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(a) the provision of clinics offering diagnosis, treatment and support for patients suffering with migraine and primary headache; (b) the provision of information and signposting to alleviate the impact of such disorders and to grow awareness; (c) the promotion of research into the causes, treatment and alleviation of migraine and other forms of headache; and (d) the publication of the useful results of such research.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED BY GI. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.