Dogfen lywodraethu HACKNEY ISLAMIC COMMUNITY CENTRE


Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2022 AS AMENDED ON 27 AUG 2022 AS AMENDED ON 03 SEP 2022 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2023 AS AMENDED ON 28 MAY 2024 as amended on 01 Nov 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MOSQUE, OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSLIM CHILDREN BY PROVIDING A SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOL AND FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND EDUCATION DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.