Dogfen lywodraethu COMPASSION IN DYING

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/06/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/09/2011 as amended on 21 Sep 2023 as amended on 31 Jan 2025 as amended on 31 Jan 2025
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1.1 The objects of the Charity (“the Objects”) are for the benefit of the public and by all exclusively charitable means the relief of suffering and the advancement of education, including, without limitation,:- (a) to research all aspects of end of life issues including the needs and views of people connected with or affected by end of life issues and to advance the development of better end of life care, including palliative care; (b) to provide advice to the general public and to health care professionals as regards end of life options, including health care options; (c) to provide advocacy, mediation and dispute resolution services in connection with end of life issues, to supply legally recognized guidance, information and documents to the public, including health care professionals, in connection with end of life options and in particular living wills, advance statements and advance directives and to provide information, advice and guidance both to the public and to health care professionals in connection with the above. 1.2 Throughout these Articles of Association a “charitable purpose” is a purpose that is regarded as charitable in the laws of England and Wales and of Scotland, and the term “charitable” is to be interpreted in accordance with the laws of England and Wales and of Scotland.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE: NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS IN ENGLAND AND WALES, SCOTLAND AND NORTHERN IRELAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.