GATEWAY FURNITURE AND BABY PROJECT
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
1) To relieve people in need or hardship or who are aged or sick and to relieve distress; By the provision of furniture and baby equipment 2) To advance education in accordance with Christian principles re: i) areas relating to the homeless, housing, the family and parenting matters ii) in the training of unemployed volunteers In Ashford, Kent.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 September 2017
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Gweithgareddau Crefyddol
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Grwpiau Diffi Niedig Eraill
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Caint
Llywodraethu
- 23 Hydref 2006: Cofrestrwyd
- 03 Ionawr 2020: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
- Trin cwynion
- Buddiannau croes
- Talu staff
- Rheoli risg
- Diogelu buddiolwyr agored i niwed
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 30/09/2016 | 30/09/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £96.86k | £96.73k | £95.09k | £102.01k | £5 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £96.65k | £96.65k | £97.65k | £116.29k | £46.09k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2019 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2018 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2017 | 28 Mehefin 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2017 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Medi 2016 | 16 Mai 2017 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Medi 2016 | 16 Mai 2017 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JULY 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
(A) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FURNITURE AND BABY EQUIPMENT IN ASHFORD KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY: (I) IN AREAS RELATING TO HOMELESSNESS HOUSING FAMILY AND PARENTING MATTERS AND (II) IN THE TRAINING OF UNEMPLOYED VOLUNTEERS IN ASHFORD KENT AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHARITY.
Maes buddion
ASHFORD, KENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window