SEARCH FOR COMMON GROUND - UK

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
In a world full of violent conflict, Search for Common Ground (www.sfcg.org) is a beacon of hope. Search for Common Ground UK is an independent registered charity in the UK. We seek to raise awareness of violent conflict across the world, and fundraise to support the conflict transformation work of Search for Common Ground internationally, through projects, talks, training and events in the UK.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 December 2023
Pobl

4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Hawliau Dynol/cytgord Crefyddol Neu Hiliol/cydraddoldeb Neu Amrywiaeth
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 14 Chwefror 2008: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
4 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lord Jeremy Purvis | Cadeirydd | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Timms | Ymddiriedolwr | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Woollcombe | Ymddiriedolwr | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Shamil Idriss | Ymddiriedolwr | 12 September 2017 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £365 | £180 | £492 | £180 | £1.08k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.84k | £1.07k | £559 | £893 | £1.81k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | 10 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | 20 Mehefin 2023 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | 05 Ebrill 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | 09 Mehefin 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2020 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | 23 Gorffennaf 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Rhagfyr 2019 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES (INCORPORATED) 06 DECEMBER 2005 MEMORANDUM CHANGED BY RESOLUTION 17 JANUARY 2008 as amended on 21 Jul 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
)1 TO PROMOTE CONFLICT RESOLUTION AND RECONCILIATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITH A VIEW TO BUILDING AND MAINTAINING SOCIAL COHESION AND TRUST WITHIN AND BETWEEN COMMUNITIES BY: A) PROMOTING SERVICES DIRECTED TO THE RESOLUTION OF CONFLICT BETWEEN PERSONS, ORGANISATIONS OR GROUPS THROUGH THE MEANS OF MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION.. B)PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING CONCERNING THE RESOLUTION OF DISPUTES OR CONFLICTS AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE UNDERSTANDING OF THE NATURE AND CAUSES OF DISPUTES OR CONFLICTS AND OF THE MEANS OF MANAGING THEM. PROVIDED THAT ALL ACTIVITIES SHALL BE BALANCED AND SHALL MAINTAIN OR ENHANCE THE TRUST'S COMMITMENT TO REMAINING IMPARTIAL. II) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY AND RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: A)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS IN EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY. B) PROMOTING ACTIVITIES TO FOSTER UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN PEOPLE FROM DIVERSE BACKGROUNDS AND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS C) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS D)CULTIVATING A SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY E) PROVIDING EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ISSUES RELATED TO CONFLICT AND DIVERSITY DIRECTED TO PRODUCING FAIR AND ACCURATE MEDIA COVERAGE III)TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE USE OF CONCILIATION, MEDIATION AND OTHER METHODS AND PROCEDURES FOR RESOLVING DISPUTES BETWEEN INDIVIDUALS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
Vounder
Tresillian
TRURO
Cornwall
TR2 4BW
- Ffôn:
- 07825374493
- E-bost:
- lnelson@sfcg.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window