Dogfen lywodraethu OCEAN HARMONY
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JANUARY 2004 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2007, 16 JANUARY 2008, 14 JANUARY 2009 AND 20 JANUARY 2010 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 18/01/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEMBERS IN THE BARBERSHOP STYLE OF SINGING AS DEFINED BY THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF BARBERSHOP SINGERS (BABS). IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECTIVE, THE CLUB WILL PROMOTE CLOSE HARMONY, SINGING, ENCOURAGE THE MEMBERSHIP TO ATTEND WEEKLY REHEARSALS AND CRAFT DEVELOPMENT SESSIONS, ADOPT THE BABS CODE OF ETHICS AND PARTICIPATE IN BABS EVENTS. THE CLUB WILL GIVE CONCERTS AND RECRUIT NEW MEMBERS BY HOLDING BY HOLDING "OPEN EVENINGS".
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. COLBURY
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.