Dogfen lywodraethu MEDAILLE TRUST
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 17 Dec 2020 as amended on 11 Mar 2021 as amended on 19 Mar 2021 as amended on 17 Dec 2020 as amended on 21 Mar 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The Charity’s objects are for the public benefit: a) The relief of need of men, women and children who have been victims of trafficking and those vulnerable to trafficking by providing or assisting, anywhere in the UK or overseas, in: (i) the provision of safe housing, medical care, counselling, or other such support; (ii) the relief of unemployment through support, advice and training; and (iii) access to justice for victims and promoting justice by working with other organisations to prevent people trafficking, prosecute traffickers and protect victims including but not limited to supporting central and local governments, regional and individual police forces, border and immigration agencies and other organisations, whether statutory or voluntary. b) To advance public education about the plight of men, women and children who have been trafficked and those vulnerable to trafficking.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL.
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.