Dogfen lywodraethu BRAIN TUMOUR UK

Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/05/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/11/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1. TO PROMOTE AND ENGAGE IN RESEARCH INTO THE NATURE, CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND THE SOCIAL CONSEQUENCE OF TUMOURS OF THE BRAIN AND CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM 2 TO PROMOTE SUPPORT AND INFORM PEOPLE WITH THESE DISEASES , IN PARTICULAR, BUT NO EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND SUPPORT TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND THEIR CARERS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO TUMOURS OF THE BRAIN AND CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.