Dogfen lywodraethu John Lewis Partnership Foundation
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 JAN 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUN 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19 NOV 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2021 as amended on 30 Jan 2024
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES, ACTING ALONE OR IN ASSOCIATION WITH OTHERS, BY SUCH CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, TO INCLUDE (WITHOUT LIMITATION) CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES DESIGNED TO BENEFIT THE COMMUNITIES IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS IN WHICH THOSE WHO PRODUCE PRODUCTS FOR JOHN LEWIS STORES LIVE AND WORK
Maes buddion
UK AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.