Dogfen lywodraethu RENEWABLE WORLD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 NOV 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 DEC 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 MAY 2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 JUN 2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 OCT 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3.1 TO RELIEVE POVERTY; 3.2. THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT BY THE REDUCTION OF CARBON EMISSIONS AND THE PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES; AND 3.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND INTERESTED PARTIES IN EFFECTIVE REDUCTION OF GREENHOUSE GASSES, THE EFFECTS OF CLIMATE CHANGE, AND SUSTAINABLE SOLUTIONS TO PROBLEMS ARISING FROM CLIMATE CHANGE, AND TO PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT RESEARCH INTO SUCH ISSUES AND TO PUBLISH AND WIDELY DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.