Dogfen lywodraethu URBAN YOUTH ACTION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/04/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/12/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 19/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS FORMED (THE “OBJECTS”) ARE: 1. THE PROVISION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SUTTON, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; 2. FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (BY WAY OF SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT; 3. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH; AND 4. THE REHABILITATION OF EX-OFFENDERS AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME.
Maes buddion
SUTTON, SURREY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.