Dogfen lywodraethu ADHD FOUNDATION
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/10/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 15/10/12 CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 19/2/13 as amended on 26 Jan 2018 as amended on 16 Oct 2015
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1) THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 19 IDENTIFIED WITH ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS AND THEIR FAMILIES. 2) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION ATTENTION DEFICIT HYPERACTIVITY DISORDER AND ASSOCIATED CONDITIONS.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.