THE ARTS INCLUDED AT THORNHILL (TAIT)
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To advance the education of young people from Sunderland, one of the most historically disadvantaged areas in the country, in particular but not exclusively, those pupils who are at risk of exclusion, by the provision of personal, social, health and citizenship education through arts based activities.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2011
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Sunderland
Llywodraethu
- 07 Ionawr 2008: Cofrestrwyd
- 21 Rhagfyr 2011: Tynnwyd (WEDI PEIDIO Â BODOLI)
Dim enwau eraill
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £10.40k | £11.01k | £7.01k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £6.29k | £6.98k | £11.10k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2011 | 28 Hydref 2011 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2011 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2010 | 20 Hydref 2010 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2010 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 24 Medi 2009 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2009 | 26 Ionawr 2010 | Ar amser |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOVEMBER 2007.
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE * TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM SUNDERLAND, ONE OF THE MOST HISTORICALLY DISADVANTAGED AREAS IN IN COUNTRY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THOSE PUPILS WHO ARE AT RISK OF EXCLUSION, BY THE PROVISION OF PERSONAL, SOCIAL, HEALTH AND CITIZENSHIP EDUCATION THROUGH ARTS BASED ACTIVITIES. * TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF SOCIALLY DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE ABOVE AREA IN SUCH AWAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY .
Maes buddion
SUNDERLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window