THE DUKE OF YORK'S COMMUNITY INITIATIVE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
To promote, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions, any charitable purpose for the benefit of the inhabitants of the United Kingdom and, in particular, those of the county of Yorkshire.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 30 June 2022
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Dibenion Elusennol Cyffredinol
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Anabledd
- Celfyddydau / Diwylliant / Treftadaeth / Gwyddoniaeth
- Chwaraeon/adloniant
- Amgylchedd/cadwraeth/treftadaeth
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Dibenion Elusennol Erall
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Elusennau Eraill/cyrff Gwirfoddol
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Rhoi Grantiau I Sefydliadau
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Noddi Neu’n Gwneud Gwaith Ymchwil
- Gweithredu Fel Corff Mantell Neu Gorff Adnoddau
- Arall Neu Ddim Un O’r Rhain
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 01 Mehefin 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Gorffennaf 2024: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- THE DUKE OF YORK'SCOMMUNITY INITIATIVE (Enw blaenorol)
- THE YORKSHIRE FOUNDATION (Enw blaenorol)
- Buddiannau croes
- Rheoli gwirfoddolwyr
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £53.29k | £14.00k | £5.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £30.47k | £30.60k | £34.90k | £524 | £883 | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2024 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2023 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2022 | 24 Mai 2023 | 24 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2021 | 18 Mawrth 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 30 Mehefin 2020 | 07 Mai 2021 | 7 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 30 Mehefin 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
3. OBJECTS THE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE (WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE INHABITANTS OF THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS, THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT AND/OR BY ACTING AS AN UMBRELLA ORGANISATION (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO: (A) PROVIDE RELIEF FROM FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE SAID INHABITANTS AND TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE LIFE OF THEIR COMMUNITY IN WAYS WHICH ADDRESS AND ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE; (B) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES, THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; AND THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT.
Maes buddion
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN PARTICULAR THE COUNTY OF YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window