LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH

Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Encouraging neighbourliness and community spirit. Latest crime trends, crime prevention advice and information sent out in online Neighbourhood Watch Newsletter. Recruitment and information sharing through stalls at local events.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 31 March 2024
Pobl

2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Gweithwyr sydd â chyfanswm buddion dros £60,000
Dim gwybodaeth ar gaelCodi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Economaidd/datblygiad Cymunedol/cyfl Ogaeth
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Yr Henoed/pobl Oedrannus
- Pobl Ag Anableddau
- Y Cyhoedd/dynolryw
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Sutton
Llywodraethu
- 03 Awst 2007: Cofrestrwyd
Dim enwau eraill
Ymddiriedolwyr
Ymddiriedolwyr yw’r bobl sy’n gyfrifol am reoli’ gwaith, rheolaeth a gweinyddiaeth yr elusen. Gellir adnabod ymddiriedolwyr wrth enwau eraill megis cyfarwyddwyr, aelodau pwyllgor, llywodraethwyr neu rywbeth arall, ac nid ydynt fel arfer wedi’u cyflogi gan yr elusen. Mae’r ymddiriedolwyr yn gyfrifol am ddiweddaru'r rhestr hon a gallant wneud hyn wrth ddiweddaru eu manylion fel y maent yn digwydd trwy'r gwasanaeth ar-lein.
2 Ymddiriedolwyr
Enw | Rôl | Dyddiad y penodiad | Ymddiriedolaethau eraill | Statws adrodd ymddiriedolaethau eraill | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anna James | Cadeirydd | 01 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Colin Pye | Ymddiriedolwr | 01 July 2004 |
|
|
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £0 | £3.00k | £1 | £4.05k | £4.07k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £1.86k | £220 | £1.44k | £2.22k | £5.09k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2024 | 01 Hydref 2024 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2024 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2023 | 01 Hydref 2024 | 244 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2023 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2022 | 22 Gorffennaf 2022 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2022 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2021 | 09 Gorffennaf 2021 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2021 | Not Required | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 31 Mawrth 2020 | 16 Tachwedd 2020 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 31 Mawrth 2020 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2011
Gwrthrychau elusennol
1 TO PROMOTE GOOD CITIZENSHIP AND GREATER PARTICIPATIONIN THE WORK OF POLICE LOCAL AUTHORITY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS, STRIVING TO IMPROVE COMMUNITY SAFETY IN LONDON BOROUGH AND SUTTON. 2 THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON PART AND NON SECTARIAN IN RELIGION AND SHALL OPERATE AN EQUAL OPPORTUNITIES POLICY. 3 PROVIDE SERVICES FOR AND ON BEHALF OF ALL NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH GROUPS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SUTTON POLICE AREA. 4 TO LIASE WITH OTHER NEIGHBOURHOOD WATCH GROUPS, THE SUTTON CRIME REDUCTIONPANEL, THE SUTTON POLICE COMMUNITY CONSULTATIVE GROUP AND OTHER VOLUNTARY BODIES. 5 PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE SAME, NATIONALLY, INTERNALLY, AND LOCALLY, AND TO THAT END MAY BRING TOGETHER IN CONFERENCE, REPRESENTATIVES OF VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS, GOVERNMENT DEPARTMENTS, STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND INDIVIDUALS. 6 ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR OR JOIN IN ARRANGING AND PROVIDING FOR THE HOLDING OF EXHIBITIONS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, CLASSES, SEMINARS AND TRAINING COURSES. 7 PROMOTE AND CARRY OUT OR ASSIST IN PROMOTING AND CARRYING OUT RESEARCH, SURVEYS AND INVESTIGATIONS AND PUBLISH RESULTS THEREOF. 8 COLLECT AND DISSEMINATE INFORMATION ON ALL MATTERS AFFECTING THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND EXCHANGE INFORMATION WITH OTHER BODIED WHETHER IN THIS COUNTRY OR OVERSEAS. 9 UNDERTAKE, EXECUTE, MANAGE OR ASSIST ANY CHARITABLE TRUST WHICH MAY LAWFULLY BE UNDERTAKEN, EXECUTED OR ASSISTED BY THE ASSOCIATION. 10 PROCURE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINT, PUBLISH, ISSUE AND CIRCULATE GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE SUCH PAPERS, BOOKS, PERIODICALS, PAMPHLETS OR OTHER DOCUMENTS OR FILMS OR RECORDED TAPES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ABOVE PURPOSE.
Maes buddion
LONDON BOROUGH SUTTON
Contact Information
- Cyfeiriad yr elusen:
-
140 Park Lane
CARSHALTON
SM5 3DT
- Ffôn:
- 02083959917
- E-bost:
- annagrahamjames@googlemail.com
- Gwefan:
-
suttonneighbourhoodwatch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window