Dogfen lywodraethu HAZARA COMMUNITY MILTON KEYNES
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 24/08/2008 AS AMENDED ON 20/12/2011 AS AMENDED ON 08 OCT 2017 as amended on 18 Mar 2018
Gwrthrychau elusennol
!, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC RELIGION. 3. THE PROVISIONS OF THE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR THE LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Maes buddion
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.