Dogfen lywodraethu INDEPENDENT HOUSING UK LTD
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 06/12/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13/03/2013 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/03/2013 as amended on 12 Jan 2021 as amended on 10 May 2021
Gwrthrychau elusennol
The charity's objects ('Objects') are specifically restricted to the following: To relieve the needs of people in vulnerable circumstances including those with learning disabilities, mental health problems and/or physical disabilities by ensuring that they have access to quality social housing which is suitable to their individual need and preference.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, WALES
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.