PHOENIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Phoenix Zimbabwe provides financial assistance to Zimbabwean exiles, primarily in the UK, who wish to pursue courses of professional development or vocational training that will equip them to participate in the rebuilding the economy and institutions of Zimbabwe when circumstances allow them to return home.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 05 April 2014
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Rhoi Cymorth I’r Tlodion
- Pobl O Dras Ethnig Neu Hiliol Arbennig
- Rhoi Grantiau I Unigolion
- Cymru A Lloegr
Llywodraethu
- 30 Mai 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 12 Ebrill 2017: Tynnwyd (NID YW'N GWEITHREDU)
- PHONIX FUND FOR ZIMBABWE (Enw blaenorol)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £2.00k | £98.28k | £1.25k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £14.34k | £18.81k | £15.54k | £1.07k | £5.62k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2017 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2016 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2015 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 05 Ebrill 2014 | 12 Hydref 2014 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 05 Ebrill 2014 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST, DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2006
Gwrthrychau elusennol
I) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND UNEMPLOYMENT AMONG ZIMBABWEANS WHO HAVE SOUGHT ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM BY PROVIDING VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ENABLE THEM TO MAKE A CONTRIBUTION TO REBUILDING ZIMBABWE. II) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PEOPLE LIVING OR WORKING IN ZIMBABWE OR IN TEMPORARY EXILE FROM ZIMBABWE BY PROVIDING THEM WITH VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. III) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM FROM ZIMBABWE AND SUCH OTHER GENERAL OBJECTS AS ARE CHARITABLE BY LAW.
Maes buddion
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window