THE CHARLOTTE PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN AFRICA
Trosolwg o'r elusen
Gweithgareddau - sut mae'r elusen yn gwario ei harian
Raising funds for the production of primary reading books, our own 256-page, African-context dictionary and other materials for schools in southern Africa. Recruiting, training and supporting a group of CharChar Literacy Support Specialists in English literacy and phonics to help local primary schools improve English teaching skills and prepare students for later studies in the English medium.
Incwm a gwariant
Data ar gyfer y flwyddyn ariannol yn gorffen 29 February 2020
Codi arian
Masnachu
Taliadau i ymddiriedolwyr
Beth, pwy, sut, ble
- Addysg/hyfforddiant
- Plant/pobl Ifanc
- Darparu Adnoddau Dynol
- Darparu Adeiladau/cyfl Eusterau/lle Agored
- Darparu Gwasanaethau
- Darparu Eiriolaeth/cyngor/gwybodaeth
- Malawi
Llywodraethu
- 24 Mawrth 2021: y trosglwyddwyd cronfeydd i 1192510 CHARCHAR LITERACY
- 20 Gorffennaf 2007: Cofrestrwyd
- 24 Mawrth 2021: Tynnwyd (CRONFEYDD WEDI'U TROSGLWYDDO (INCOR))
- CHARCHAR TRUST (Enw gwaith)
Hanes ariannol
Dyddiad diwedd cyfnod ariannol
Incwm / Gwariant | 29/02/2016 | 28/02/2017 | 28/02/2018 | 28/02/2019 | 29/02/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Cyfanswm Incwm Gros | £49.32k | £4.26k | £2.18k | £32.58k | £32.30k | |
|
Cyfanswm gwariant | £0 | £37.28k | £35.87k | £19.04k | £31.51k | |
|
Incwm o gontractau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Incwm o grantiau'r llywodraeth | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Cyfrifon a datganiadau enillion blynyddol
Teitl | Blwyddyn adrodd | Dyddiad derbyn | Derbyniwyd | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2021 | Heb ei gyflwyno | ||
Adroddiad blynyddol | 29 Chwefror 2020 | 08 Chwefror 2021 | 41 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 29 Chwefror 2020 | 08 Chwefror 2021 | 41 diwrnod yn hwyr | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2019 | 05 Rhagfyr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2019 | 05 Rhagfyr 2019 | Ar amser | |
Adroddiad blynyddol | 28 Chwefror 2018 | 29 Tachwedd 2018 | Ar amser | |
Cyfrifon a TAR | 28 Chwefror 2018 | Not Required |
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 MAY 2007
Gwrthrychau elusennol
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PRIMARY AND/OR SECONDARY EDUCATION IN AFRICA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF BASIC EDUCATIONAL MATERIALS INCLUDING TEXTBOOKS, WRITING MATERIALS AND TEACHING AIDS, AND/OR STRATEGIC SUPPORT IN ENHANCING ATTENDANCE, AND/OR, WHERE FOUNDS PERMIT, THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS ENABLING PROMISING STUDENTS TO ATTEND LEADING NATIONAL SCHOOLS. THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL USE THEIR DISCRETION IN IDENTIFYING THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS OF AFRICA IN WHICH THE CHARITY SHALL OPERATE, TAKING COGNISANCE OF THE FUNDS AVAILABLE TO THEM, THE EDUCATIONAL. AND ECONOMIC NEEDS OF THE RECIPIENTS AND THE ECONOMIC EFFECTIVENESS OF THEIR DECISIONS. DECISIONS ON GRANTING AID WILL IGNORE THE RACE, RELIGION, SEX AND/OR POLITICAL AFFILIATIONS OF THE RECIPIENTS AND IN ALL ITS ACTIONS THE CHARITY WILL RESPECT THE RECIPIENTSã RIGHT TO SELF-DETERMINATION AND INDEPENDENCE.
Maes buddion
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Diolch am eich adborth. Oes gennych 5 munud i rannu eich barn am y gwasanaeth hwn?Open in new window