Dogfen lywodraethu ARCHBISHOP HOLGATE'S SCHOOL FUND
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu'r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14/03/2006 AS AMENDED ON 27/06/2007 AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2010 AS AMENDED ON 03/12/2012
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF ARCHBISHOP HOLGATE'S SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT BUT NOT FURTHER OR OTHERWISE, THE FUND MAY UNDERTAKE ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SCHOOL AND FURTHER THE EDUCATION AND ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF THE PUPILS.
Maes buddion
NORTH YORKSHIRE 'NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE'
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.